Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 48 m/e 05/1905
BR 30048 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal During 01/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 58 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ELH Eastleigh 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75D Horsham 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 19/08/1959
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 19/04/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75D Horsham 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 19/08/1959
LOAN 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 29/04/1963
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 48
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30048    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Horsham (75D)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
19/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
19/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30048    

prev prev