Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 299 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5268 Week
» 17781 Month
» 105973 Year
» 990354 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 49   05/1905
BR 30049   04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/06/1962
Scrapping During 06/1962
Service Life 57 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75D Horsham 4w/e 11/04/1951
75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960
70C Guildford 5w/e 06/07/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 02/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75D Horsham 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 70C Guildford 6w/e 06/07/1961
WDN   w/e 02/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 49
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 30049    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Horsham (75D)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
02/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30049    

prev prev