Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 50 m/e 06/1905
BR 30050 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 06/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/01/1962
Scrapping During 02/1962
Service Life 56 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960
71A Eastleigh 7w/e 03/05/1961
71B Bournemouth 5w/e 06/07/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 27/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HOR Horsham 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 71D Fratton 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 75D Horsham w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 7w/e 03/05/1961
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 06/07/1961
WDN   w/e 27/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 50
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30050    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
03/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
27/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30050    

prev prev