Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 29 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1701 Week
» 20022 Month
» 108214 Year
» 992595 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 51 m/e 11/1905
BR 30051 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 11/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/09/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 56 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71D Fratton 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953
75D Horsham 4w/e 01/10/1953
75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960
70A Nine Elms 7w/e 03/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 29/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71D Fratton 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 6w/e 20/07/1953
ALLOC 75D Horsham 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 03/05/1961
WDN   w/e 29/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 51
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30051    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Horsham (75D)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
03/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
29/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30051    

prev prev