Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 833 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 833 Week
» 21815 Month
» 163769 Year
» 1048150 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 52 m/e 12/1905
BR 30052 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Scrapping During 10/1964
Service Life 58 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E Faversham 6w/e 27/03/1953
75A Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953
75E Three Bridges 6w/e 21/06/1955
75A Brighton 6w/e 15/06/1956
75E Three Bridges 7w/e 08/10/1957
75A Brighton 3w/e 13/10/1958
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 14/06/1959
75E Three Bridges 5w/e 26/11/1959
75A Brighton 5w/e 10/06/1960
70A Nine Elms 7w/e 03/05/1961
72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 22/10/1962
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 19/04/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71D Fratton 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 75A Brighton 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 75A Brighton 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 10/06/1960
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 03/05/1961
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 22/10/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/03/1963
LOAN 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 29/04/1963
WDN   w/e 17/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 52
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30052    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
10/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
03/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
22/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
19/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30052    

prev prev