Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 577 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 577 Week
» 18898 Month
» 107090 Year
» 991471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 53 m/e 12/1905
BR 30053 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Service Life 58 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ELH Eastleigh 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71D Fratton 4w/e 08/12/1950
73E Faversham 6w/e 27/03/1953
75A Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 14/06/1959
75A Brighton 4w/e 10/03/1960
75E Three Bridges 7w/e 03/05/1961
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 02/07/1962
75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 30/01/1963
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
70F Bournemouth m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71D Fratton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 71D Fratton 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 75A Brighton 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 7w/e 03/05/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 17/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 53
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30053    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
03/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30053    

prev prev