Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 54 m/e 12/1905
BR 30054 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal During 01/1959
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 53 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FRA Fratton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 06/10/1951
75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 21/06/1955
75A Brighton 6w/e 15/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton w/e 06/12/1951
TOSTORE 70F Fratton 8w/e 08/02/1955
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 10/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 54
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30054    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30054    

prev prev