Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 901 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1801 Week
» 13622 Month
» 182394 Year
» 1066775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 55 m/e 12/1905
BR 30055 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sun 15/09/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 57 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951
71D Fratton 8w/e 20/07/1953
75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 21/06/1955
75A Brighton 7w/e 20/04/1956
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 14/06/1959
75E Three Bridges 5w/e 26/11/1959
75E Three Bridges 7w/e 23/08/1961
70C Guildford 4w/e 30/07/1962
75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 30/01/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1963
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton 6w/e 20/07/1953
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton 9w/e 10/04/1956
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 30/07/1962
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   w/e 15/09/1963
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 55
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30055    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
20/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
23/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
30/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30055    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    

prev prev