Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 906 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1806 Week
» 13627 Month
» 182399 Year
» 1066780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 56 m/e 01/1906
BR 30056 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 01/1906
Withdrawal w/e Sun 08/12/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963
Service Life 57 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951
75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 21/06/1955
75A Brighton 6w/e 15/06/1956
75E Three Bridges 7w/e 08/10/1957
75A Brighton 3w/e 13/10/1958
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 14/06/1959
75A Brighton 6w/e 22/10/1959
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 03/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 08/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 75A Brighton 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75A Brighton 9w/e 22/10/1959
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 7w/e 03/05/1961
WDN   w/e 08/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1906 To Service To service as SR Number 56
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30056    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
22/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
03/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30056    

prev prev