Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 29 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1701 Week
» 20022 Month
» 108214 Year
» 992595 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 57 m/e 01/1906
BR 30057 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 01/1906
Withdrawal During 06/1963
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 57 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 21/06/1955
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 15/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 23/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1906 To Service To service as SR Number 57
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30057    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30057    

prev prev