Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 833 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 833 Week
» 21815 Month
» 163769 Year
» 1048150 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 58 m/e 03/1906
BR 30058 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1906
Withdrawal During 09/1960
Scrapping During 10/1960
Service Life 54 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YEO Yeovil Town 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 06/10/1951
75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 21/06/1955
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 15/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 24/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1906 To Service To service as SR Number 58
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yeovil Town (YEO)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30058    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 30058    

prev prev