Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19156 Week
» 72172 Month
» 191699 Year
» 3218552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
62 |
y/e |
1942 |
British Railways |
30062 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
USA |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Ironwork (USA) |
Works Number |
4375 |
To Service |
During y/e 1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
21 yrs , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1942 |
SOT |
|
Southampton Docks |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1947 |
General |
New 'West Country' Class completed were 21C153-155. Fourteen of the American type 0-6-0 side tanks have been purchased and are to be numbered 61-74: the U.S.A. Nos. are 1277/84, 4326, 1952/60/66/73 (Vulcan Iron Works Nos. 4375/82/88, 4425/33/39/46/47) and 1264, 1388/96, 1402/18/19 (H. K. Porter Nos. 7420, 7502/10/16/32/33). |
SLS/194702 |
31/05/1947 |
Southampton Docks |
Some of the U.S.A. 0-6-0 tanks, by Vulcan Iron Works, are already at work in Southern livery: 70 (ex-1960) and 72 (ex-1973) appeared in April, and 62 (ex-1277), 67 (ex-1282) and 66 (ex-1279) in May. Nos. 1959, 1971, and 1974 will soon be out as 64, 68 and 73 respectively. Other engines noted on the Docks in May were: 176 Guernsey, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 96 Normandy, 102 Granville, 147 Dinard (all Class 'B.4') and a 0-4-0 saddle tank (name removed) MDE 177 (Barclay 1188/1910) derelict. Also two Stroudley 'E.1' tanks, one of which was 689. 89 Trouville was at Brighton, 82, 87 and 3744 at Eastleigh. A large number of withdrawn locos. still stand at Eastleigh, including W10, 3334 and L.B.S.C.R. 683 now showing the Marsh livery and lining, the S. & M. markings having disappeared; (this last was No. 9 Daphne on the S. & M.R.): also what must be the last L.S.W. duplicate number, 332 with underline. |
SLS/194708 |
15/11/1947 |
Southampton Docks |
On 15/11/47 the bulk of the work at Southampton Docks was being performed by the ex U.S.A. 0-6-0T's, except for the passenger shunting which is still being carried out by the 'El' 0-6-0T's; only three 'B4's' were noted-all dead. U.S.A. 0-6-0T's in the Docks or on shed comprised:-S.R. Nos. 62-64, 66-69, 72 an 73, also U.S. No. 4326. |
SLS/194801 |
30/09/1948 |
Southampton Docks |
No. 30062 is also now painted 'British Railways,' etc., in Gill Sans style, with smokebox numberplate. Nos, 81/5 are occasionally in steam, but Nos. 97 an 147 are still out of service in the old fruit warehouse. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 62 Built at Vulcan Ironwork (USA), Works Number 4375 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30062 |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30062 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|