Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 719 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 32193 Month
» 66835 Year
» 1288400 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 64 y/e 1943
BR 30064 y/e 1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class USA
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Ironwork (USA)
Works Number 4432
To Service During y/e 1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Service Life 24 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SOT Southampton Docks 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/06/1963
91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 22/08/1966
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 17/10/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/06/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 22/08/1966
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 17/10/1966
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1943 To Service To service as SR Number 64
Built at Vulcan Ironwork (USA), Works Number 4432
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT)    
1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 30064    
24/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
22/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
17/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 30064    

prev prev