30/11/1946 |
General |
We understand that ex L.B. & S.C. Rly. No. 82 Boxhill is being restored to her original condition, and that she is to be painted in the old Brighton livery for preservation by the Southern Rly |
SLS/194701 |
31/05/1947 |
Southampton Docks |
Some of the U.S.A. 0-6-0 tanks, by Vulcan Iron Works, are already at work in Southern livery: 70 (ex-1960) and 72 (ex-1973) appeared in April, and 62 (ex-1277), 67 (ex-1282) and 66 (ex-1279) in May. Nos. 1959, 1971, and 1974 will soon be out as 64, 68 and 73 respectively. Other engines noted on the Docks in May were: 176 Guernsey, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 96 Normandy, 102 Granville, 147 Dinard (all Class 'B.4') and a 0-4-0 saddle tank (name removed) MDE 177 (Barclay 1188/1910) derelict. Also two Stroudley 'E.1' tanks, one of which was 689. 89 Trouville was at Brighton, 82, 87 and 3744 at Eastleigh. A large number of withdrawn locos. still stand at Eastleigh, including W10, 3334 and L.B.S.C.R. 683 now showing the Marsh livery and lining, the S. & M. markings having disappeared; (this last was No. 9 Daphne on the S. & M.R.): also what must be the last L.S.W. duplicate number, 332 with underline. |
SLS/194708 |
10/02/1948 |
Eastleigh MPD |
Of the 'B4' tank class, the shed contained Nos. 82, 88, an 89 Trouville. Other miscellaneous engines noted were:- 'C.14' 3744 and 0-6-OT 756 A. S. Harris at Eastleigh shed, and 0-4-OST (Barclay 1188/10) ex Soton Docks, formerly MDE 177 The Master General in the condemned road |
SLS/194803 |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
12/08/1950 |
S.R. Renumbering |
The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. |
SLS/195012 |
28/04/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. |
SLS/195106 |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |