Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 1114 Today
» 1291 Yesterday
» 2405 Week
» 34194 Month
» 182959 Year
» 1404524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 96 m/e 11/1893
BR 30096 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class B4
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-0T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 11/1893
Withdrawal w/e Sun 06/10/1963
Service Life 69 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New)   11/1893
ELH Eastleigh   01/01/1948
71A Eastleigh   07/10/1950
   Withdrawn   06/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh P 02/01/1948
ALLOC AFD Ashford 6w/e 26/09/1949
WDN   w/e 06/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1893 To Service To service as SR Number 96
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30096    
10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30096    

prev prev