Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1784 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25415 Week
» 90369 Month
» 293033 Year
» 3319886 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
98 |
m/e |
11/1893 |
British Railways |
30098 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
B4 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 11/1893 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1949 |
Service Life |
55 yrs , 3 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
OFFSTOCK |
UNK |
|
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Southampton Docks |
Some of the U.S.A. 0-6-0 tanks, by Vulcan Iron Works, are already at work in Southern livery: 70 (ex-1960) and 72 (ex-1973) appeared in April, and 62 (ex-1277), 67 (ex-1282) and 66 (ex-1279) in May. Nos. 1959, 1971, and 1974 will soon be out as 64, 68 and 73 respectively. Other engines noted on the Docks in May were: 176 Guernsey, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 96 Normandy, 102 Granville, 147 Dinard (all Class 'B.4') and a 0-4-0 saddle tank (name removed) MDE 177 (Barclay 1188/1910) derelict. Also two Stroudley 'E.1' tanks, one of which was 689. 89 Trouville was at Brighton, 82, 87 and 3744 at Eastleigh. A large number of withdrawn locos. still stand at Eastleigh, including W10, 3334 and L.B.S.C.R. 683 now showing the Marsh livery and lining, the S. & M. markings having disappeared; (this last was No. 9 Daphne on the S. & M.R.): also what must be the last L.S.W. duplicate number, 332 with underline. |
SLS/194708 |
10/02/1948 |
Southampton Docks |
In the Docks were 'B4' tanks Nos. 81 Jersey (in steam), and 85 Alderney, 96 Normandy, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 101 Dinan, 147 Dinard, and 176 Guernsey (all out of use). No. 87 was shunting at the Terminus |
SLS/194803 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 98 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 30098 but not taken up |
|
|
02/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 98 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|