Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 287 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3526 Week
» 16039 Month
» 104231 Year
» 988612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 105   03/1905
BR 30105   07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1905
Withdrawal During 05/1963
Scrapping During 06/1963
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 21/04/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 29/04/1963
WDN   01/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 105
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30105    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30105    

prev prev