Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 834 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 834 Week
» 21816 Month
» 163770 Year
» 1048151 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 112 m/e 07/1900
BR 30112 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963
Scrapping During 04/1963
Service Life 62 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C Guildford 4w/e 02/1962
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 02/04/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 112
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30112    
02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30112    

prev prev