Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1288 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24919 Week
» 89873 Month
» 292537 Year
» 3319390 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
119 |
m/e |
08/1899 |
British Railways |
30119 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 08/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/12/1952 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1899 |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
71C |
|
Dorchester |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
27/12/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
TOSTORE |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
REINS |
71C |
Dorchester |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/12/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 119 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30119 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dorchester (71C) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30119 |
|
|
02/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|