Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 19 Today
» 1102 Yesterday
» 6719 Week
» 29225 Month
» 332415 Year
» 1553980 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 120 m/e 08/1899
British Railways 30120 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 08/1899
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Service Life 63 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1899
ELH Eastleigh on 01/01/1948
71C Dorchester 4w/e 12/05/1951
70C Guildford 5w/e 11/12/1952
71C Dorchester 4w/e 08/01/1953
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/10/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 18/03/1961
71A Eastleigh m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 71A Eastleigh m/e 31/08/1950
REINS 71C Dorchester 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 71C Dorchester 4w/e 08/01/1953
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 18/03/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 09/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/01/1960 Eastleigh MPD On shed: 30182(72C), 30236(72F), 30120 in steam; 32646/61 have acquired 71A shed plates but not 32677 which is in a poor state. SLS/196002
05/09/1961 Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. SLS/196110
04/11/1961 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. SLS/196112
26/11/1961 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. SLS/196201
28/02/1962 Drummond T9 restored The last Drummond ex-L.S.W.R. Class T9 4-4-0 loco. 30120 scheduled for preservation was out-shopped ex-Eastleigh Works during March, completely restored to the full glory of its pre-Grouping livery and numbered L.S.W.R. 120. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1899 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 120
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30120    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dorchester (71C)    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Dorchester (71C)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
18/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30120    

prev prev