Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 814 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18617 Week
» 71633 Month
» 191160 Year
» 3218013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
121 |
m/e |
08/1899 |
British Railways |
30121 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 08/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/04/1951 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1899 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
m/e |
30/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
P |
01/12/1947 |
TOSTORE |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/01/1948 |
Eastleigh MPD |
The following oil-burning locomotives were on Eastleigh shed: Nos. 121, 155/57, 170, 286, 411/63, 713/40/45/48 an 752. |
SLS/194802 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 121 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30121 |
|
|
04/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30121 |
|
|