Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 326 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 326 Week
» 7510 Month
» 315491 Year
» 1199872 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 124 m/e 02/1903
BR 30124 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 02/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/05/1961
Scrapping During 06/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/03/1952
70C Guildford 3w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 20/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 31/10/1956
WDN   w/e 20/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 124
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30124    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30124    

prev prev