Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 129 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 18251 Month
» 187023 Year
» 1071404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 133 m/e 03/1903
BR 30133 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sun 15/03/1964
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 61 yrs , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 8w/e 07/10/1952
70A Nine Elms 5w/e 11/12/1952
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 14/02/1953
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 20/08/1954
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 05/04/1960
75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 30/01/1963
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
70E Salisbury m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 15/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 11/12/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 20/08/1954
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 05/04/1960
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 15/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/04/1960 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 133
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30133    
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
20/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
05/04/1960 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30133    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev