Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 610 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6394 Week
» 27783 Month
» 147310 Year
» 3174163 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
140 |
m/e |
10/1902 |
British Railways |
30140 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Small Hoppers |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 10/1902 |
Withdrawal |
During 01/1950 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1902 |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
01/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
FEL |
Feltham |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
WDN |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
on |
21/01/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/05/1950 |
Horley MPD |
'K.10' No. 140 has joined the condemned locos. here. 'C.2' No. 2436 was still intact on 4/5/50, also 0.1 No. 1377. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 140 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 30140 but not taken up |
|
|
01/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 140 |
|
|
03/06/1950 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: Horley |
|
|