Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 312 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18115 Week
» 71131 Month
» 190658 Year
» 3217511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
164 |
m/e |
10/1903 |
British Railways |
30164 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Large Hoppers |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 10/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1951 |
Service Life |
48 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1903 |
FRA |
|
Fratton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
FRA |
|
Fratton |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
FRA |
Fratton |
5w/e |
04/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
FRA |
Fratton |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
FEL |
Feltham |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 164 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
26/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30164 |
|
|
10/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30164 |
|
|
10/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|