Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 903 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1803 Week
» 13624 Month
» 182396 Year
» 1066777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 241 m/e 05/1899
BR 30241 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/07/1963
Scrapping During 10/1963
Service Life 64 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 22/10/1962
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 22/10/1962
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 01/04/1963
WDN   w/e 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 241
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30241    
22/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30241    

prev prev