Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 243 m/e 03/1897
BR 30243 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1897
Withdrawal During 09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 61 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 08/12/1950
70A Nine Elms 9w/e 30/06/1952
70B Feltham 7w/e 08/10/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70B Feltham q/e 08/10/1957
WDN   2w/e 13/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 243
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30243    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 30243    

prev prev