Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1097 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5671 Week
» 33629 Month
» 68271 Year
» 1289836 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 245 m/e 04/1897
BR 30245 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 04/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 65 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72E Barnstaple Junction 9w/e 30/06/1952
70A Nine Elms 5w/e 11/12/1952
75B Redhill 4w/e 10/12/1953
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/02/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 11/12/1952
ALLOC 75B Redhill 10w/e 10/12/1953
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 08/02/1954
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 245
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30245    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
10/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30245    

prev prev