Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 577 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 577 Week
» 18898 Month
» 107090 Year
» 991471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 246 m/e 04/1897
BR 30246 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 04/1897
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 64 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 246
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 30246    
20/07/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30246    

prev prev