Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 36 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5468 Week
» 17289 Month
» 186061 Year
» 1070442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 251 m/e 06/1897
BR 30251 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 06/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/07/1963
Scrapping During 08/1963
Service Life 66 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70B Feltham 3w/e 30/01/1963
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 13/05/1954
REINS 72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 22/06/1954
TOSTORE 72E Barnstaple Junction 9w/e 31/10/1954
TOSTORE 72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 72E Barnstaple Junction w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 70B Feltham 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 01/04/1963
WDN   w/e 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 251
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 30251    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30251    

prev prev