Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 252 m/e 08/1897
BR 30252 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 08/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/02/1959
Scrapping During 03/1959
Service Life 61 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 07/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 72E Barnstaple Junction 5w/e 16/09/1955
REINS 72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 07/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 252
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30252    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
20/07/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30252    

prev prev