Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1423 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19226 Week
» 72242 Month
» 191769 Year
» 3218622 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
266 |
m/e |
10/1894 |
British Railways |
30266 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 10/1894 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1960 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 266 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30266 |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30266 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|