Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1337 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19140 Week
» 72156 Month
» 191683 Year
» 3218536 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
270 |
m/e |
11/1896 |
British Railways |
30270 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 11/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/01/1959 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70E |
Reading (S.R.) |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
TOSTORE |
72B |
Salisbury |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
REINS |
72B |
Salisbury |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 270 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30270 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30270 |
|
|
02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|