|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1900 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 277 Built at Nine Elms Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30277 | ||
20/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) | ||
31/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (71H) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) | ||
11/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
13/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
19/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
10/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
01/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) | ||
01/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30277 |