Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 132 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4947 Week
» 11081 Month
» 238965 Year
» 1460530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 282 m/e 11/1899
BR 30282 m/e 12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 11/1899
Withdrawal During 03/1954
Scrapping During 07/1954
Service Life 54 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1899
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE EXJ Exmouth Junction 9w/e 01/06/1948
REINS 71A Eastleigh m/e 31/08/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/02/1948 Eastleigh Works During the early part of February a large batch of withdrawn engines was still on hand in the various sidings, including Adams 0-4-4T Nos. 4, 6, 17, an 364: Beattie 0-6-OST 0332, 3334; Stroudley 0-6-OT W10, W12, and L.B.S.C.R. 683; Stroudley 0-4-2T 2232, 2233, 2240, 2255, 2355, an 2627; Adams 4-4-0 657; Adams 0-4-2 597-600, 609, 612, 613, 620, 625, 634, 637, 638, 644, 646, an 649; Drummond 4-4-0 150, 347. Engines in shops included 'B4X' No. 2060, 'El/R' No. 2135, and 'B4' Tank No. 93 St. Malo. Engines in the area in 'B.R' livery were Nos. S27, S64, S182, S203, S224, S255, S282, S453 King Arthur, S465, S535, S750 Morgan le Fay, S21C108 Padstow, and S21C105 Barnstaple. Only the three named ones were green. The 'Austerity' 2-10-0's are not having 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tender, nor the prefix 'S'; also the numerals are small (as used on coaching stock); as repaired they are being parked at Ringwood; 73776 was at the shed ready for transit, and 73781 an 73788 outside the works SLS/194803
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
25/10/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). SLS/195112
06/11/1951 Eastleigh Works On this date there was no sign of 756, either on shed or in works, so that it may have been broken up. 30253 was renumbered on 5th November, and DS3191 (ex 612) and 30426/7 were being cut up. Other engines in the scrap yard were S282, 30396, 30728/9, 2056, 2067. SLS/195201
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (SR) (Recently in shops) Engines running with Southern Numbers. (March 1952) 42, 87, 88, 93, 162, 224, 304, 311, 691, 1064/5, 1191, 1276, 1336, 1491/3, 1558, 1574, 1673, 1693, 1708, 1711/8, 1755, 2133, 2328, 2418, 2485, 2560/73, 2608. Stored (oil-burners): 170, 172, 411, 437. Recently in shops: 282, 2408. Some of these may be renumbered, as there has been no recent official advice. SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1899 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 282
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
03/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 282    
12/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to 30282    

prev prev