Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 283 m/e 12/1899
BR 30283 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/12/1957
Scrapping During 01/1958
Service Life 58 yrs , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 05/02/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 28/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 3w/e 28/05/1949
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/07/1950
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 05/02/1951
WDN   w/e 28/12/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 283
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30283    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 30283    

prev prev