Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4810 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18853 Week
» 83807 Month
» 286471 Year
» 3313324 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
307 |
m/e |
02/1901 |
British Railways |
30307 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 02/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/12/1952 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 307 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
30/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30307 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30307 |
|
|
05/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|