Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2186 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15592 Week
» 68608 Month
» 188135 Year
» 3214988 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
309 |
m/e |
05/1901 |
British Railways |
30309 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 05/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/12/1962 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1901 |
GFD |
|
Guildford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
70G |
|
|
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FEL |
Feltham |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 309 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30309 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
23/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30309 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|