Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 127 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5936 Week
» 13120 Month
» 321101 Year
» 1205482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 313 m/e 09/1901
BR 30313 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/07/1961
Scrapping During 09/1961
Service Life 59 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ELH Eastleigh 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70G   4w/e 12/05/1951
72B Salisbury 6w/e 18/06/1954
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 19/08/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 70C Guildford 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 19/08/1959
WDN   w/e 22/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as SR Number 313
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30313    
12/05/1951 Allocation      
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
16/07/1954 Sightings Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
19/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30313    

prev prev