Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3794 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13368 Week
» 78322 Month
» 280986 Year
» 3307839 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
317 |
m/e |
05/1897 |
British Railways |
30317 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 05/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/07/1961 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1897 |
SAL |
|
Salisbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
72A |
|
Exmouth Junction |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
7w/e |
10/04/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 317 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30317 |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30317 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|