Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 995 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5569 Week
» 33527 Month
» 68169 Year
» 1289734 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 321 m/e 08/1900
BR 30321 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 08/1900
Withdrawal Sun 30/09/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BPL Barnstaple Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A Nine Elms 8w/e 07/10/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 30/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 30/07/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/08/1962
ALLOC 83H Plymouth Friary 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 321
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barnstaple Junction (BPL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30321    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30321    

prev prev