Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 325 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 325 Week
» 7509 Month
» 315490 Year
» 1199871 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 323 m/e 10/1900
BR 30323 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal Sat 19/12/1959
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 19/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
WDN   19/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 323
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30323    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30323    

prev prev