Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 899 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1799 Week
» 13620 Month
» 182392 Year
» 1066773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 324 m/e 10/1900
BR 30324 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/09/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 58 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 9w/e 08/02/1955
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 19/12/1955
   Withdrawn w/e 12/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 08/02/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 7w/e 19/12/1955
WDN   w/e 12/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 324
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30324    
16/07/1954 Sightings Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
08/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
19/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30324    

prev prev