Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 176 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6383 Week
» 3896 Month
» 231780 Year
» 1453345 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 327 m/e 06/1897
BR 30327 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Black Motors
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 06/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/05/1961
Scrapping During 06/1961
Service Life 63 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1897
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948
72B Salisbury 4w/e 11/12/1954
72B Salisbury 6w/e 21/06/1955
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 11/03/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 27/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 12/01/1959
WDN   w/e 27/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/10/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). SLS/195112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1897 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 327
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30327    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30327    

prev prev