Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 232 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 232 Week
» 18553 Month
» 106745 Year
» 991126 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 328   11/1911
BR 30328   03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 11/1911
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/03/1963
Scrapping During 06/1963
Service Life 51 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 9w/e 08/02/1955
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 21/06/1955
75E Three Bridges 7w/e 19/12/1955
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 15/06/1956
73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/03/1960
75A Brighton 7w/e 23/08/1960
71A Eastleigh 7w/e 03/05/1961
71B Bournemouth 5w/e 06/07/1961
75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 30/01/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 03/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 08/02/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth w/e 21/06/1955
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 7w/e 19/12/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 75A Brighton 7w/e 23/08/1960
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 7w/e 03/05/1961
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 06/07/1961
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   w/e 03/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1911 To Service To service as SR Number 328
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30328    
08/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
19/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
23/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
03/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
03/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30328    

prev prev