Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1170 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14576 Week
» 67592 Month
» 187119 Year
» 3213972 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
330 |
m/e |
09/1905 |
British Railways |
30330 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie |
Class |
H15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/05/1957 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
SAL |
Salisbury |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
SAL |
Salisbury |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
REINS |
70B |
Feltham |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 330 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30330 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30330 |
|
|
06/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|