Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 273 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14316 Week
» 79270 Month
» 281934 Year
» 3308787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
350 |
m/e |
08/1897 |
British Railways |
30350 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 08/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/03/1962 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1897 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70C |
|
Guildford |
4w/e |
29/10/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 350 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30350 |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30350 |
|
|