Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 665 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4181 Week
» 32139 Month
» 66781 Year
» 1288346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 356 m/e 10/1900
BR 30356 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/12/1958
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
71D Fratton 8w/e 20/07/1953
71A Eastleigh 9w/e 08/02/1955
70F Fratton q/e 06/06/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 06/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton 6w/e 20/07/1953
TOSTORE 70F Fratton 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 70F Fratton 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 08/02/1955
ALLOC 70F Fratton 8w/e 06/06/1958
WDN   w/e 06/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 356
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 30356    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
08/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (70F)    
12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 30356    

prev prev