Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1038 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5612 Week
» 33570 Month
» 68212 Year
» 1289777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 374 m/e 04/1903
BR 30374 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 04/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/10/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 05/02/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 10/12/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 08/02/1954
72B Salisbury 3w/e 17/11/1956
72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 12/06/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 10/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 70E Reading (S.R.) 10w/e 10/12/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 11/06/1957
WDN   w/e 10/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 374
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30374    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30374    

prev prev