Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 647 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4163 Week
» 32121 Month
» 66763 Year
» 1288328 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 375 m/e 05/1903
BR 30375 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1903
Withdrawal Sun 30/09/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 59 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
71A Eastleigh 8w/e 20/07/1953
72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 05/04/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 30/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 20/07/1953
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 30/07/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/08/1962
ALLOC 83H Plymouth Friary 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 375
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30375    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30375    

prev prev